Bjp education minister
WebJul 7, 2024 · Modi Cabinet reshuffle July 7, 2024: President of India has accepted the resignations of Union ministers Harsh Vardhan (Health), Ravi Shankar Prasad (Law/IT), Prakash Javadekar (Environment/I&B), Ramesh Pokhriyal (Education), Santosh Gangwar (Labour) and Sadananda Gowda (Chemicals & Fertilizers). The oath-taking ceremony for … WebThe Bjelke-Petersen Ministry was a ministry of the Government of Queensland and was led by Premier Joh Bjelke-Petersen, who led the Country Party and its successor, the …
Bjp education minister
Did you know?
WebJan 2, 2024 · BJP: MoS Ministry of Education: 29: A. Narayanaswamy: BJP: MoS Ministry of Social Justice and Empowerment: 30: Kaushal Kishore: BJP: MoS Ministry … WebJun 14, 2024 · As Education Minister Bratya Basu started speaking after the completion of the discussion on the Bill, the BJP MLAs started protesting shouting "shame, shame!" …
Web1 hour ago · PATNA: Launching a veiled attack on the BJP-led NDA, Bihar chief minister Nitish Kumar on Friday said those who will vote for them in the next year's Lok Sabha elections will bring destruction on ... WebJul 7, 2024 · In the biggest-ever expansion of the Council of Ministers, the Prime Minister on Wednesday had assigned key responsibilities such as IT and Communication to the Wharton-educated Ashwini Vaishnaw, Health to Mansukh Mandaviya, Civil Aviation to Jyotiraditya Scindia, Education and Skill Development to Dharmendra Pradhan, …
WebDec 10, 2024 · Education Minister, Dr. Ramesh Pokhriyal Nishank was live from 10 AM to 11 AM on his Facebook and Twitter pages. Via the live, he discussed many queries of … WebMinister of Education Accessibility AAA Dr Rajkumar Ranjan Singh Dr Rajkumar Ranjan Singh MoS, Govt. Of India Dr Rajkumar Ranjan Singh App Dr. Subhas Sarkar Dr. Subhas Sarkar MoS, Govt. Of India Dr. Subhas Sarkar App Smt Annpurna Devi Smt Annpurna Devi MoS, Govt. Of India Smt Annpurna Devi App Shri Dharmendra Pradhan
WebApr 4, 2024 · BJP leaders including Rajya Sabha MP and president of National OBC Morcha K. Laxman and Telangana party president Bandi Sanjay Kumar have demanded the resignation of Education Minister...
Web7 hours ago · Chennai: Releasing what he calls the "DMK files", Tamil Nadu BJP Chief K Annamalai today made public a long list of assets worth Rs 1.34 lakh crore which he claims are owned by key DMK leaders ... macbook pro with monitor setupWebJul 14, 2024 · List of education ministers in India till date/Ministry of Human Resource Development (MHRD): 1. Maulana Abul Kalam Azad (10 Years 5 Months) Abul Kalam Muhiyuddin Ahmed Azad was an Indian scholar and a senior political leader of the Indian Independence Movement born on 11th November 1888 in Mecca (now in Saudi Arabia). macbook pro with most memoryWeb4 hours ago · Hubballi (K’taka), Apr 14 (PTI) Amid uncertainty over whether the BJP would give a ticket to senior leader and former Chief Minister Jagadish Shettar to contest in the … macbook pro without batteryWebJan 2, 2024 · There are two education ministers in Karnataka. B C Nagesh handles primary and secondary education while Dr. Ashwath Narayan handles higher education. Dr. K. Sudhakar is in charge if Medical education department in current Karnataka government. List Of Karnataka Ministers Source: karnataka.gov.in & Basavaraj S … macbook pro with nvidiaWebPrime Minister 1 Maulana Abul Kalam Azad: 15 August 1947 22 January 1958 10 years, 160 days Indian National Congress: Jawaharlal Nehru: 2 K. L. Shrimali: 22 January 1958 … kitchen remodel cost richmond vaWeb2 hours ago · 1x 1.5x 1.8x. Kerala, which had witnessed intense protests due to which the state government had to shelve its proposed flagship Silver Line semi-high-speed rail corridor project, will get a new Vande Bharat Express train from the Centre soon. Though an official announcement is yet to come, the state BJP leadership confirmed on Friday that ... macbook pro with number padWebNov 17, 2024 · The current Chief Minister of Bihar is Nitish Kumar from JD (U). He is the longest standing CM of Bihar. He has become the Chief Minister for the fourth straight term. He took charge as the CM of Bihar for the first time on 24 November 2005. Who is the current Bihar Education Minister? macbook pro without bar review